Perez v. Wellfleet Communications
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Defendant: Allen Roach and Wellfleet Communications
Case Number: 2:2016cv02353
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:160(1) National Labor Relations Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f)(3), the Court GRANTS summary judgment in favor of Plaintiff. Plaintiff may recover $1,457,989.54 in damages against Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 189 Plaintiff's First Proposed Pretrial Order is DENIED as moot.The Clerk of Court shall close the case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants are required to advise the Court, within ten calendar days of the issuance of this Order, whether they intend to retain legal representation in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting 188 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Puneet Kumar Garg and Anthony B. Golden withdrawn from the case. Defendants shall have 30 days from the date of this Order to retain new counsel. Settlement Conference currently set for 2/10/2020 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Denying 177 Motion for Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file their proposed joint pretrial order within thirty (30) days from entry of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to Local Rule 16-5, this case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Youchah for a settlement conference. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 124 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend or Correct the Complaint is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have twenty-one (21) days to file a limited motion to reopen discovery. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that 157 Defendants' Motion to Strike is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 155 Defendants' Objection to the Magistrate Judge Order is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Denying 64 Motion to Dismiss, Denying 71 Motion to Dismiss, Denying 148 Motion for Summary Judgment, Denying 149 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 150 Motion for Summary Judgment. Supplemental Brief with calculation of damages due by 10/15/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Re: In Camera Review re 134 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 125 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Against Defendants Ryan Roach, New Choice Communications, Inc., and Lighthouse Communications, LLC is granted. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Granting 144 Motion to Admit Government Attorney: Marc A Pilotin for R. Alexander Acosta. Attorney Susan Seletsky terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Granting 142 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 134 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing reset for 6/5/2018 at 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 SCHEDULING ORDER granting 137 Stipulation. Motions due by 6/29/2018. Responses due by 8/15/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Granting 127 Stipulation to Continue Hearing Re: 125 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing reset for 5/9/2018 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 85 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is granted. Defendants shall serve supplemental responses to the requests for production of documents within fourteen days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 76 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 64 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 39 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum on JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo, N.A., and G&S Tax and Accounting Services, Inc.; and 41 Motion for Protective Orde r is granted, in part, and denied, in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall, if necessary, submit a revised discovery plan and scheduling order in light of the time this matter has been under submission to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation to Extend Time. Lighthouse Communications, LLC, New Choice Communications, Inc. and Ryan Roach answer due 11/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 59 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Motion in Response to First Amended Complaint. (Motions due by 10/10/2017., Responses due by 11/7/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have ten (10) days from the entry of this Order to file the Amended Complaint separately on the docket. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that 5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment, is DENIED as moot. The Court denies this motion without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 22 Defendants' Motion to Enforce LR IA 11-3 and to Strike All Documents Filed in this Action by Plaintiff is granted, in part, and denied, in part. Defendants' request to enforce LR IA 11-3 is grant ed. However, Defendants' request to strike all documents filed by Plaintiff is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 23 Defendants' Motion to Quash Subpoena isdenied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 3 Stipulation for Extension of Time and Briefing Schedule. ( Motions due by 1/3/2017., Responses due by 1/24/2017., Replies due by 2/13/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Wellfleet Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Represented By: Laura Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellfleet Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?