Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 2679 et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: ATC Assessment Collection Group LLC, LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 2679 and Redrock Park Homeowners' Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02363
Filed: October 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation to Extend Time re: 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 3/7/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Stipulation Re: 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/7/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 29 plaintiff's motion to set briefing be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Luis A Ayon terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Stephen G. Clough terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 2679 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATC Assessment Collection Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV Real Estate Strategic Investment Group LLC Series 2679
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redrock Park Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?