ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does

Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Defendant: John & Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2016cv02384
Filed: October 13, 2016
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Magistrate Judge Koppe's 26 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED and REJECTED in part. All Defendants except for Margaret Bacote-Newman are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Entry of Clerks Defau lt is Granted. The clerk shall enter default against defendant Bacote-Newman. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) Modified to correct docket text on 11/15/2017 (SLD).
June 13, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that all Defendants except Defendant Laurie Manzi be SEVERED and DISMISSED without prejudice. To the extent any subpoenas remain outstanding in this case, they are hereby QUASHED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to promptly s erve a copy of this order on the recipients of any outstanding subpoenas and shall file a proof of service by 6/20/2017. Plaintiff is ORDERED to promptly serve a copy of this order and report and recommendation as well as the order and report and r ecommendation issued concurrently in Case No. 2:17-cv-00724-JCM-NJK, on any defendant who has not yet appeared and shall file a proof of service by 6/20/2017. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 20, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this case is transferred to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy Koppe for all further proceedings. All future filings for this case must bear case number 2:16-cv-02384-JCM-NJK. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file a copy of this order in any future case that it files in this district that is related to the Mechanic: Resurrection copyright. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 1, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 3 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?