Hutchinson v. Global Experience Specialists Inc
Plaintiff: Stephanie Hutchinson
Defendant: Global Experience Specialists Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv02397
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice pursuant to ECF No. 63 Stipulation. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 58 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude and for Attorney's Fees Pursuant to FRCP 37. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting ECF No. 54 Stipulation: Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting ECF No. 47 Stipulation: Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/17/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting ECF No. 45 Stipulation : Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting ECF No. 43 Stipulation : Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that GES's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 25 ) is denied in part and granted in part. It is denied as to Hutchinson's FMLA claim for relief but granted on the common law negligence claim. The Court declines to rule on GES's request to limit Hutchinson's potential damage recovery. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting ECF No. 34 Defendant Global Experience Specialists Inc.'s Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply to Summary Judgment (ECF No. 25 ). Reply due by 5/4/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Stipulation; Discovery due by 2/16/2018. Motions due by 3/19/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchinson v. Global Experience Specialists Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Experience Specialists Inc
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Hutchinson
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?