Nelson v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Desiree Nelson
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2016cv02402
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Extend Time re 20 Motion to Remand. (Responses due by 12/13/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 12, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court must serve SSA and issue summons as stated in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Certified Mail pursuant to Order - JM)
May 23, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 1 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court must file Plaintiff's complaint 2 -1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint 2 -1 is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, with leave to amend. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, Plaintiff must file the amended complaint by 6/22/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Nelson
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?