Westwood v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.

Plaintiff: Giovanna Westwood
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02409
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
0 Judge: Richard F. Boulware
1 Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 40 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 11, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's 34 Motion to Strike 19 Request for Judicial Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 17, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 22 Motion to Compel Discovery is denied, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 5, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint be Denied. Objections to R&R due by 5/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 14, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Strike 9 Response - Other. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westwood v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanna Westwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?