Wells Fargo Bank National Association v. Woodward Family Trust et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Defendant: Hidden Canyon Owners Association, Ferdinand Vasquez, Madeleine Vazquez and Woodward Family Trust
Case Number: 2:2016cv02449
Filed: October 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 71 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/5/2018 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 67 Stipulation to Extend Time to Submit Dismissal Papers. Submission of dismissal papers deadline extended an additional 45 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that the Court will construe the 65 Joint Status Report as a Stipulation and will GRANT it in part. The deadline to file dismissal papers is extended to 3/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting as unopposed 59 Motion to Substitute Ricardo Fojas in place of Woodward Family Trust and 60 Motion to Substitute Defendant Ferdinand Vasquez in place of Madeleine Vasquez. Joint Status Report due by 1/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Re: 56 and 57 Notices. Mr. Vasquez must file a proper motion to substitute by 12/13/2017. Ricardo Fojas indicated that he intends to move to be substituted in place of Defendant Woodward Family Trust. Such motion must be filed by 12/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re 54 Notice (Other), 53 Notice (Other). The deadline by which these defendants shall comply with the Court's previous 52 order is hereby EXTENDED to November 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 49 Motion Discharging Attorney Randal Alan Deshazer as Counsel of Record. Mr. Deshazer shall file a proof of service by 9/25/2017 re service of this order on Defendants Woodward Family Trust, Ferdinand Vasque z, and Madeleine Vasquez. Defendants Ferdinand Vasquez, Madeleine Vasquez and Woodward Family Trust shall either have their new attorney file a notice of appearance or file a notice of intent to proceed pro se by 10/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Reopen Discovery. Discovery due by 12/7/2017. Motions due by 1/7/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Motion to Remove Attorney Sean N. Payne from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to manually file, no later than 2/15/17, the AO 85 form regarding consent to trial by magistrate judge. The parties are also ORDERED to execute and electronically file, no later than 2/15/17, either Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that the parties are to file no later than 2/2/2017 either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan; or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank National Association v. Woodward Family Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hidden Canyon Owners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferdinand Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madeleine Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodward Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Sean Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?