Lopez v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonia Lopez
Defendant: Kroger Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv02457
Filed: October 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice; Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/16/2018.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; denying 19 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Company
Represented By: Jerry S. Busby
Represented By: Jonathan J. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Lopez
Represented By: Sean K Claggett
Represented By: Matthew S Granda
Represented By: Jennifer Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?