McLaughlin et al v. Walmart Stores, Inc
Plaintiff: Michelle McLaughlin and Ryan McLaughlin
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv02476
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that the hearing on Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order to Postpone FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition and Motion to Stay FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition (ECF No. 23 ) and Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Appe ar for Its FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition; and Request for Attorney Fees and Appropriate Sanctions (ECF No. 24 ) scheduled for 10:00 AM, May 5, 2017 is VACATED.Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order to Postpone FRCP 30(b)(6 ) Deposition and Motion to Stay FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition (ECF No. 23 ) and Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Appear for Its FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition; and Request for Attorney Fees and Appropriate Sanctions (ECF No. 24 ), and Motion to Compel (ECF No. 29 ) are DENIED as MOOT without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that a stipulation and order for dismissal must be filed on or before May 30, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ORDER. ORDERED that the Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition scheduled for April 17, 2017 is stayed, pending further order of the court. FURTHER ORDERED that any opposition to Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order to Postpone FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition and Motion to Stay FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition (ECF No. 23 ) must be filed on or before April 25, 2017. Any reply in support of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order to Postpone FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition and Motion to Stay FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition (ECF No. 23 ) must be filed on or before May 2, 2017. FURTHER ORDERED that any opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Appear for Its FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposi tion; and Request for Attorney Fees and Appropriate Sanctions (ECF No. 24 ) must be filed on or before April 5, 2017. Any reply in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Appear for Its FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition; and Request for A ttorney Fees and Appropriate Sanctions (ECF No. 24 ) must be filed on or before May 2, 2017. FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order to Postpone FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition and Motion to Stay FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition (ECF Nos. 23 ) and Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Appear for Its FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition; and Request for Attorney Fees and Appropriate Sanctions (ECF No. 24 ) is scheduled for 10:00 AM, May 5, 2017, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 27 replaced on 4/18/2017 - nef regenerated) (MMM).
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that the deposition scheduled for 4/17/2017 is stayed, pending further order of the court. Hearing set for 23 and 24 Motions for 5/5/2017 10:00am in Courtroom 3D. Responses due 4/25/2017., Replies due 5/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that 16 Wal-Marts Motion to Stay FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 10 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLaughlin et al v. Walmart Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle McLaughlin
Represented By: Edward J. Achrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan McLaughlin
Represented By: Edward J. Achrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc
Represented By: Brenda H Entzminger
Represented By: Betsy C. Jefferis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?