Amarin Pharma, Inc. et al v. Roxane Laboratories, Inc. et.al,
Plaintiff: Amarin Pharma, Inc. and Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC and Roxane Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02525
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 BENCH ORDER - The Court finds that Defendants' proposed ANDA Products will induce infringement of the Asserted Claims, but all the Asserted Claims are invalid as obvious under 35 U.S.C. § 103. Thus, the Court finds in favor of Defendant s on Plaintiff's remaining infringement claim, and in their favor on their counterclaims asserting the invalidity of the Asserted Claims under 35 U.S.C. § 103. The Clerk of Court is ordered to enter judgment in favor of Defendants on Plaintiffs' claim and on Defendants' counterclaims, and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDERED that Defendants' motion to seal (ECF No. 334 ) is denied. It is further ordered that Plaintiffs must show cause in writing within five days of the date of entry of this order (1/15/2020) why the Court should not unseal the un redacted briefs referenced in Defendants' motion to seal (ECF Nos. 335 , 336 ). If Plaintiffs do not respond within five days, the Court will direct the Clerk of Court to unseal the documents. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDERED that Defendants' consolidated motion in limine (ECF No. 291 ) is granted in part, and denied in part, as specified herein. Plaintiffs' consolidated motion in limine (ECF No. 292 ) is denied except to the extent it seeks to bar the testimony of Mr. Kunin and Mr. Godici. Defendants' motion to seal (ECF No. 297 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' motion to seal (ECF No. 300 ) is denied. Defendants must show cause in writing within five days (1/7/2020) why the Court should not unseal the exhibits referenced in Plaintiffs' motion to seal (ECF Nos. 301 , 302 , 303 , 304 ). If Defendants do not respond within five days, the Court will direct the Clerk of Court to unseal the documents. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 1/2/2020 for punctuation (DRM).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER Scheduling a Settlement Conference for 12/16/2019 at 9:00 AM in the third floor LV Chambers of Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. The settlement conference statements shall be submitted, in an envelope marked "Confidential," dir ectly to the undersigned's box in the Clerk's Office not later than 3:00 PM on 12/6/2019. DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 236 ) as to noninfringement is granted in part, and denied in part, as specified herein. Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 234 ) granted in part , and denied in part as moot, as specified herein. Defendants' Motion to Seal (ECF No. 235 ) is granted in part, and denied in part as specified herein. Defendants must file a supplemental brief or not more than five pages withi n 10 days of the date of entry of this order providing additional argument as specified herein. Plaintiffs will have 10 days to file a response to Defendants supplemental brief, though none is required. No reply will be permitted. Defendants' Motion to Seal (ECF No. 246 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal (ECF No. 254 ) is granted. Defendants' Motion to Seal (ECF No. 261 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal (ECF No. 265 ) is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting ECF No. 267 Motion for leave to file the motion to compel under seal; the Clerk is instructed to keep ECF No. 269 under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting ECF No. 230 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James Barabas for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd, and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/1/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting ECF No. 205 Motion to Extend Time: Joint Status Report due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting ECF No. 195 Joint Motion to Extend Time: Joint Status Report due by 4/11/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER - The Court GRANTS the parties' stipulation (ECF No. 176 ). The expert disclosure deadline is extended to January 14, 2019. Additionally, the Court SETS a telephonic hearing on Defendants' motion to modify the discover y plan and scheduling order (ECF No. 165 ) on January 14, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall call the Court conference line at 877-402-9757 at least five minutes prior to the hearing. The conference code is 6791056. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER approving ECF No. 172 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Eimeric Reig-Plessis and approving Designation of Local Counsel Wayne A. Shaffer. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER that pending before the Court is ECF No. 165 Motion to modify the discovery plan and scheduling order. A response to be filed no later than 12/27/2018 and any reply be filed no later than 1/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting ECF No. 163 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/18/2018. Attorney Dmitry Shelhoff terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting ECF No. 161 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles B. Klein for Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/12/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER approving ECF No. 143 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Dmitry Shelhoff on behalf of Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. (and Ltd.) and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael D. Rounds. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/12/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER that due to conflicting duties of the Court, the settlement conference set in this case is hereby ADVANCED to 9:30 a.m. on October 9, 2018. Settlement statements shall be submitted by 3:00 p.m. on October 2, 2018. All other requirements in the order at Docket No. 136 continue to govern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting ECF No. 137 Motion to remove attorney John Rozendaal, Michael Joffre, Chandrika Vira, John P. Desmond, Brian R. Irvine, Justin James Bustos from the Electronic Service List in this case on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER that the Court has reviewed the arguments and cases and determines that they do not warrant discussion as they do not affect the outcome of this claim construction. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 CONSENT JUDGMENT pursuant to ECF No. 127 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) Modified on 5/25/2018 to correct doc title(LH).
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting ECF No. 116 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Eric R. Sonnenschein for Amarin Pharma Inc and Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Mir anda M. Du on 4/4/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting ECF No. 111 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting ECF No. 108 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File Their Reply claim Construction Brief. Reply brief due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Teva's ECF No. 95 Motion to vacate settlement conference : The Court hereby VACATES the settlement conference on January 8, 2018. The Court will set a post-claim construction settlement conference after a claim construction order has been issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER that the parties are to file a stipulation seven days after entry of the claim construction order and seven days after the filing of the pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPROVING Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael N. Kennedy (ECF No. 22 in Member Case 2:16-cv-2562) for Amarin Pharma, Inc. & Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nicholas J. Santoro. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amarin Pharma, Inc. et al v. Roxane Laboratories, Inc. et.al,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarin Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Keane
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Christopher N. Sipes
Represented By: Einar Stole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarin Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited
Represented By: Megan Keane
Represented By: Nicholas J Santoro
Represented By: Christopher N. Sipes
Represented By: Einar Stole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxane Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?