Trueman v. Clark County
Plaintiff: Kristin Trueman
Defendant: Clark County
Case Number: 2:2016cv02558
Filed: November 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 8 defendant Clark County's motion to dismiss the complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE consistent with the foregoing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1 plaintiff Trueman's complaint be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation re 8 MOTION to Dismiss .( Responses due by 1/16/2017.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trueman v. Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Trueman
Represented By: Ryan Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?