Bank of New York Mellon v. Amber Hills II Homeowners' Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Amber Hills II Homeowners' Association and Mark Desisto
Case Number: 2:2016cv02576
Filed: November 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 60 Stipulation of Final Judgment Confirming Existence and Validity of Deed of Trust. FURTHER ORDERED that this order constitutes the final judgment of this Court,resolving all claims in this case with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 5/3/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 27 STIPULATION to Set Aside 23 Clerk's Entry of Default against Amber Hills II Homeowners Association. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying without prejudice 19 Stipulation for Protective Order. The parties are directed to submit a revised protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than February 13, 2017 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 01/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. Amber Hills II Homeowners' Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Represented By: Steven T. Loizzi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Hills II Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Desisto
Represented By: Steven T. Loizzi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Jesse A. Ransom
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?