Luxottica Group S.p.A. v. Tran
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A.
Defendant: Minh D. Tran
Case Number: 2:2016cv02584
Filed: November 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by 10/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. To date the parties have not filed a mandatory stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order. The following discovery plan and scheduling order dates shall apply: Discovery due by 6/26/2017. Motions due by 7/25/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luxottica Group S.p.A. v. Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A.
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Darin Klemchuk
Represented By: Mandi Phillips
Represented By: Marc J Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minh D. Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?