Abdou, M.D. et al v. Davita, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sherif W. Abdou, M.D. and Amir S. Bacchus, M.D.
Defendant: Davita, Inc., Healthcare Partners Holdings, LLC and Healthcare Partners, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02597
Filed: November 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting Stipulation dismissing case with prejudice. The 92 Preliminary Injunction is lifted and extinguished. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting 228 Stipulation; Re: 211 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Responses due by 12/20/2018. Replies due by 1/10/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Re: 215 Motion to Intervene, Responses due by 12/3/2018. Replies due by 12/6/2018. FURTHER ORDERED that in light of the December 3, 2018 deadline to file responses to the defendants' motion for preliminary injunction, P3 Health Group Holdings, LLC is granted leave to file an opposition. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER withdrawing 202 Motion to Compel; ORDER denying as moot 203 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Re: 165 Motion for Sanctions, 158 Motion for Protective Order, Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2018 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. FURTHER ORDERED that the subpoenas at issue in Plaintiffs' ; Emergency Motion for Protective Order (ECF No. 158) are STAYED.FURTHER ORDERED that defendants must serve a copy of this order on the thirdparty recipients of the subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 162 Motion to Seal 161 Response; Within 7 days of entry of this order, the plaintiffs shall file a publicly accessible version. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting 153 and 152 Stipulation; Re: 110 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Responses due by 4/27/2018. Replies due by 5/17/2018. Answer to 146 First Amended Answer and Counterclaim due 4/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified on 3/27/2018 (JM).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting 150 Stipulation to Withdraw 49 Motion to Compel; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 147 Stipulation; Discovery due by 12/10/2018. Motions due by 1/22/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying 100 Motion; ORDER denying 101 Motion; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 129 Stipulation; Re: 110 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Responses due by 3/27/2018. Replies due by 4/6/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 107 Stipulation to Amend Pleadings; Amendment due 4/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 123 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Re: 100 Motion, Responses due by 2/21/2018. Replies due by 2/23/2018. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2018 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 65 Motion for TRO (see order for details), FURTHER ORDERED that this Temporary Restraining Order shall expire at the conclusion of the preliminary injunction hearing on 11/17/2017, unless otherwise extended by this Court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/14/2017, nunc pro tunc 10/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 42 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdou, M.D. et al v. Davita, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherif W. Abdou, M.D.
Represented By: I. Scott Bogatz
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Represented By: Alayne M. Opie
Represented By: Jaimie Stilz
Represented By: Jamie Stilz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir S. Bacchus, M.D.
Represented By: I. Scott Bogatz
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Represented By: Alayne M. Opie
Represented By: Jaimie Stilz
Represented By: Jamie Stilz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davita, Inc.
Represented By: John R Bailey
Represented By: Joshua M Dickey
Represented By: Kelly B Stout
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Partners Holdings, LLC
Represented By: John R Bailey
Represented By: Joshua M Dickey
Represented By: Kelly B Stout
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Partners, LLC
Represented By: John R Bailey
Represented By: Joshua M Dickey
Represented By: Kelly B Stout
Represented By: Paul C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?