Selene Finance, L.P., v. Horizon Heights Community Association et al
Plaintiff: Selene Finance, L.P.,
Defendant: Horizon Heights Community Association, Joan Wong and Simon Wong
Case Number: 2:2016cv02598
Filed: November 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall strike 47 the parties' Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation to Stay Pending NRED Mediation. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Remove Attorney Cheryl A. Gramer from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 02/06/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selene Finance, L.P., v. Horizon Heights Community Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Heights Community Association
Represented By: Richard E. Haskin
Represented By: Morgan F. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selene Finance, L.P.,
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?