Calkins v. Credit One Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Calkins
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.A., Equifax, Inc. and Experian Information Services
Case Number: 2:2016cv02602
Filed: November 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. The Court ORDERS these parties to file a stipulation of dismissal no later than 7/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Re: 52 Status Report. Motions due by 6/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that parties shall file a joint status report regarding arbitration on March 12, 2018, and every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER to file a joint status report by January 11, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that 28 Motion to Stay Action is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 27 Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Stay.; Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calkins v. Credit One Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Calkins
Represented By: Vernon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Services
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?