Ford v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Kellie Trull Ford
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2016cv02614
Filed: November 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Joshua Harris is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $21,409.00. FURTHER ORDERED that Joshua Harris shall reimburse plaintiff Kellie Trull Ford the amount of $7,700.00 for EAJA fees previously paid by the Commissioner. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Attorneys' fees in the amount of $7,700.00 is awarded to Plaintiff pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. There are no costs or expenses. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 7/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation for Voluntarily Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Motion for Extension Time (Second Request) to File Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's Motions due by 4/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the Summons and Amended Complaint by certified mail (see Order for addresses). The Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the Summons and Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Order hand delivered to USM - SLD)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with the caveat that the fees shall be paid if recovery is made. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Comp laint is DISMISSED, with leave to amend. Plaintiff will have until 12/5/16, to file an Amended Complaint, if Plaintiff believes she can correct the noted deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Trull Ford
Represented By: Joshua R Harris
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?