Ditech Financial LLC v. T-Shack, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC
Defendant: Sundance Homeowners Association, Inc. and T-Shack, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02615
Filed: November 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 69 Stipulation to Dismiss Claims for Attorney's Fees. Plaintiff T-SHACK, INC.'s claims for monetary relief, including those seeking attorneys' fees and costs, as set forth in its 22 Answer to the underlying Complaint filed in this action be dismissed. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 38 Motion for Summary Judgment (First Request) and Withdrawal of 53 Response. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 32 Defendant T-Shack, Inc.'s Request to Appear Telephonically is DENIED. However, to accommodate counsel's prior travel plans, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on 28 the motion to withdraw as attorneys of record and removal from CM/ECF Service List scheduled for 7/3/2017 is rescheduled to 2:00 PM, 7/5/2017, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to 28 the Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys of Record and Removal from CM/ECF Service List must be filed on or before 6/28/2017. No reply necessary. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on 28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys of Record and Removal from CM/ECF Service List is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 7/3/2017, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that 11 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is stayed by operation of NRS 18.130(1) until the $500 cost bond is deposited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 02/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ditech Financial LLC v. T-Shack, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Represented By: Christian A Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundance Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Shack, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?