Scott v. Hoopes et al
Plaintiff: Nicolas Scott
Defendant: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints and Ethan Hoopes
Case Number: 2:2016cv02646
Filed: November 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 46 Motion to Remove Attorney David T. Blake from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that 34 Stipulation to Stay Discovery and Motion Practice Pending Mediation Between the Parties is DENIED. A hearing on 29 Defendants' Motion to Quash is set for November 7, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation Regarding Production of Defendant Ethan Hoopes' Email and Non-Waiver of Attorney Client Privilege. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Hoopes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Represented By: Daniel R McNutt
Represented By: Matthew C Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints
Represented By: Daniel R McNutt
Represented By: Matthew C Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Hoopes
Represented By: Daniel R McNutt
Represented By: Matthew C Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Scott
Represented By: Adam C Anderson
Represented By: Jared R. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?