ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2016cv02660
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DEFAULT JUDGMENT. The Court awards statutory damages to the Plaintiff against Defendant Javier Godinez, in the amount of $1,500.00. The Court further awards to the Plaintiff against Defendant Javier Godinez, fees and costs, including reasonable attorneys' fees, in the amount of $5,617.50. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 42 plaintiff's motion for default judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall prepare and file an appropriate judgment for the court's signature within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 34 Magistrate Judge Koppe's report and recommendation be, and the same hereby is, ADOPTED in part and REJECTED in part.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all defendants except for Javier Godinez be, and the same h ereby are, dismissed without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 37 plaintiff's motion for entry of clerk's default be, and the same hereby is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: the court will enter default against only defendant Javier Godinez, but not any other defendant. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned RECOMMENDS in this case that all Defendants except Defendant Javier Godinez be SEVERED and DISMISSED without prejudice. To the extent any subpoenas remain outstanding in this case, they are hereby QUASHED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to promptly serve a copy of this order on the recipients of any outstanding subpoenas, and shall file a proof of service of the same by 6/20/2017. See Order for further details. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that this case is transferred to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy Koppe for all further proceedings. All future filings for this case must bear case number 2:16-cv-02660-JCM-NJK. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file a copy of this order in any future case that it files in this district that is related to the Mechanic: Resurrection copyright. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ME2 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?