Federal Home Loan Mortage Corporation et al v. T-Shack, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, High Noon at Arlington Ranch Homeowners Association and T-Shack, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02664
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's 14 Motion to Dismiss is Denied and Plaintiff's 53 Motion for Reconsideration is Denied as moot. Plaintiff shall prepare a proposed judgment consistent with this order and submit it to the court within 30 days of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 29 Motion to Stay Discovery Pending the Resolution of the Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 6/7/2017. Replies due by 6/30/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Corrected Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/24/2017. Replies due by 6/21/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Defendant's 8 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. shall each post a cost bond in the amount of $500.00 or make a cash deposit of $500.00 as to T-Shack, Inc. within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Home Loan Mortage Corporation et al v. T-Shack, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Noon at Arlington Ranch Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Shack, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?