Daley v. CVS Pharmacy Inc
Plaintiff: Richard Daley
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv02693
Filed: November 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 47 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Ethan Thomas terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER regarding documents dated 7/19/18, and 8/6/18, that plaintiff Richard Daley mailed to the court. The court will not take any action with respect to these documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 7 defendant's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 8 defendant's motion to compel arbitration be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 35 Plaintiff Richard Daley's Mandatory Judicial Notice to Correct Error which the court construes as a motion for reconsideration, is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 12 , 13 Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc.'s Motion to Stay Discovery and for Exemption from the Early Neutral Evaluation Program is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/1/17 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daley v. CVS Pharmacy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?