Ditech Financial LLC et al v. Starfire Condominium Owners' Association et al
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC and Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Change Your Life, LLC and Starfire Condominium Owners' Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02758
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Stipulation of Final Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order constitutes the final judgment of this Court, resolving all claims in this case with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs, and the Clerk of Court is directed to enter Final Judgment accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 38 defendant's motion for clarification is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 21 days from the date of this order the parties must meet and confer and file a discovery plan and scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that within 21 days from the date of this order, the parties must meet and confer and file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 28 , 33 the intervenor defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED. Nakia Woodson's intervenor complaint 26 is DISMISSED in its entirety. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 20 Nakia Woodson's motion for leave to file is GRANTED. The Clerk shall file the proposed motion to intervene (ECF No. 20, Ex. A) and all attached exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Change Your Life, LLC answer due 1/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ditech Financial LLC et al v. Starfire Condominium Owners' Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Change Your Life, LLC
Represented By: Mary F Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starfire Condominium Owners' Association
Represented By: Jon M Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Vatana Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Vatana Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?