Bank of America, N.A. et al v. Santa Barbara Homeowners Association et al

Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A. and Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Santa Barbara Homeowners Association
Counter Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Federal National Mortgage Association
Cross Defendant: Katy L. Lee, Trustee or her successors in trust, under the Klee Living Trust, dated August 10, 2006 and Katy L. Lee
Counter Claimant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Cross Claimant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02768
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2018 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 110 Stipulation To Extend Time re ECF No. 90 Motion for Protective Order: BANA's reply due by 10/10/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 25, 2018 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 96 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for SFR to File Response to ECF Nos. 87 Motion to Stay Discovery, ECF No. 88 Motion to Quash, ECF No. 89 Joinder to Motion to Stay Discovery and ECF No. 90 Motion for Protective Order. SFR's response due by 9/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 18, 2018 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 93 Motion to Extend Time to file response to ECF No. 86 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 10/12/2018. A briefing schedule within 5 days after ECF No. 87 Motion to Stay is decided with respect to: (a) SFR's deadline to respond to Fannie Mae and BANA's motion for summary judgment; and (b) Fannie Mae and BANAs deadline to file a reply supporting their motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 10, 2018 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the court declines to resolve the pending motions (ECF Nos. 87 , 88 , 89 , 90 ) on an emergency basis. Responses and replies are due in the ordinary course, pursuant to Local Rule 7-2(b). The notice of deposition is stayed pending the resolution of plaintiffs' motions (ECF Nos. 87 , 88 , 89 , 90 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 21, 2018 83 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to ECF No. 81 Stipulation. See Order for specific details and information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 28, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that ECF No. 58 Motion to Stay Discovery is granted in part; Discovery is STAYED; ECF Nos. 71 and 72 Motions for Protective Order are denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 10, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ECF No. 59 Stipulation. Response to ECF No. 58 MOTION to Stay Discovery due by 10/13/2017; Reply due by 10/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 28, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 43 Motion to Stay, temporarily staying action until resolution of the certiorari proceedings before the USSC in Bourne Valley and/or Saticoy Bay - status report due within 15 days of such resolution; denying without prejudice ECF No. 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 14, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING ECF No. 13 Motion to certify question to Nevada Supreme Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. et al v. Santa Barbara Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Barbara Homeowners Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: William Shane Habdas
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: William Shane Habdas
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: William Shane Habdas
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: William Shane Habdas
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Katy L. Lee, Trustee or her successors in trust, under the Klee Living Trust, dated August 10, 2006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Katy L. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?