Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al v. Southern Highlands Community Association et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Southern Highlands Community Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02771
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 38 , 53 , 54 , 57 defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLCs motions to dismiss, to stay, to compel, and for Rule 56(d) relief are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 51 plaintiffs Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Federal Nat ional Mortgage Associations motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the alternative damages claims against defendant Southern Highlands Community Association and Alessi & Koenig, LLC are DISMISSED as moot and defendant So uthern Highlands Community Associations 52 motion for summary judgment is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 68 , 69 the plaintiffs motions for leave to file supplemental authority are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 57 Motion. Replies due by 8/18/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Re: 44 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time. Responses due by 4/29/2020. Replies due by 4/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 38 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 3/10/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 28 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs and Granting 29 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Security must be posted by 11/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Jesse A. Ransom withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 23 the motion to lift stay is GRANTED. The stay in this case is lifted for all purposes. A client representative must attend the meet and confer, either in person or by telephone. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED until the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK). Once the mandate issues, any party may move to lift the stay. Regardless of this stay, the plaintiffs shall timely serve process upon the defendants and file proof of service. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al v. Southern Highlands Community Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Highlands Community Association
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David J. Rothenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?