United Specialty Insurance Company v. Hachiman, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Derek Fesolai, Adam Gentile, Hachiman, LLC, Lacy's, LLC, Johnaro Laird, Marina Laird, Palomino Club, LLC, Craig Parks and Alexander Potasi
Case Number: 2:2016cv02784
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 112 Stipulation to Dismiss case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Setting Deadline - Stipulation to Dismiss or Status Report due by 8/12/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 97 Stipulation for Extension of time to Reply (First Request). Defendants will have up to and including 3/5/2020 to Reply to 92 93 Responses, to the 82 Motion to Amend/Correct and the 83 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting 88 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 79 Motion for Further Relief or, in the Alternative, to Amend the Judgment. Responses due by 2/24/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on 2/12/2020 to correct document number.
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. I ORDER that 63 the defendants' motion to strike is DENIED. I FURTHER ORDER that 51 plaintiff United Specialty Insurance Company's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The clerk of court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff United Specialty Insurance Company and against the defendants and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 57 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 6/11/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 51 Renewed/Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Responses due by 5/21/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 47 the joint motion is granted. This case is stayed until 10/22/18. The parties shall file a status report by 8/16/18. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that the parties shall file a proposed joint pretrial order on any remaining claims in this case on or before 4/20/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 38 First MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Responses due by 7/26/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation to Waive Personal Appearance Requirement for Defendant Dereck Fesolai at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the parties' 27 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order with Request to Assign this Matter for Settlement Conference is granted, in part, and denied, in part. Discovery due by 7/31/2017. Motions due by 8/30/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the 6 Order to Show Cause is deemed satisfied and the case will not be dismissed at this time. The Plaintiff remains responsible to prove jurisdiction with sufficient proof prior to entry of a judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Specialty Insurance Company v. Hachiman, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Fesolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachiman, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacy's, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnaro Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marina Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palomino Club, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Potasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: L. Renee Green
Represented By: Martin J. Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?