U.S. Bank NA v. Eagle Investors et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank NA
Defendant: Eagle Investors and Shadow Springs Community Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02785
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 51 Shadow Springs' motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 52 U.S. Bank's motion for summary judgment be, and the same her eby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 53 Eagle Investors' motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Lift Stay of Case re 41 Order. The court will lift the stay and the parties will have 60 days from the date of this order to finish discovery and file dispositive briefs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation to Temporarily Stay Litigation (Third Request). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation to Temporarily Stay Litigation. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file, no later than 3/31/2017, either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan; or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank NA v. Eagle Investors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Investors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shadow Springs Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank NA
Represented By: Justin A Shiroff
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?