U.S. Bank N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Sherman Oaks Estates Owners Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv02801
Filed: December 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER. The court now instructs the clerk to enter judgment pursuant to this court's 92 order granting default judgment. This resolves SFR's crossclaim, there are no other pending claims in this action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Cross-Defendants David L. McCoy and Pamela McCoy, any successors and assigns, have no right, title or interest in the Property and that SFR is the rightful title owner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this judgment does not adjudicate SFR's claims against, or the defenses of, any other party to this case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that SFR shall file a dispositive motion or other appropriate filing on or before 1/17/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if SFR fails to prosecute its cross-claim against the McCoys on or before 1/17/2020, the court will dismiss the cross-claim. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 87 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to the claims between U.S. Bank, N.A., SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, and Sherman Oaks Estates Owners Association. This Stipulation in no way affects SFR's cross-claim against David L. McCoy and Pamela McCoy (the "McCoys"). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Finance - MMM)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying without prejudice 65 Motion for Summary Judgment and 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 1/17/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 1/12/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 65 and 66 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 67 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply Re: 65 and 66 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/8/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that 50 Motion to Amend is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file, within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this order, a first amended complaint identical to that attached to its motion to amend (ECF No. 50-1). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of 50 Motion for Leave to File (First Request). Replies due by 9/8/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that 16 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 17 Motion for More Definite Statement is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 23 Motion to Certify a Question of Law is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 45 Joint Motion to Amend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/9/2017. Motions due by 11/7/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 7 defendant's motion for security of costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall post a cost bond in the amount of $500.00 or make a cash deposit of $500.00 within 7 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Oaks Estates Owners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Justin A Shiroff
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?