January 31, 2020 |
Filing
93
ORDER. The court now instructs the clerk to enter judgment pursuant to this court's 92 order granting default judgment. This resolves SFR's crossclaim, there are no other pending claims in this action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
January 21, 2020 |
Filing
92
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Cross-Defendants David L. McCoy and Pamela McCoy, any successors and assigns, have no right, title or interest in the Property and that SFR is the rightful title owner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this judgment does not adjudicate SFR's claims against, or the defenses of, any other party to this case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
January 8, 2020 |
Filing
90
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that SFR shall file a dispositive motion or other appropriate filing on or before 1/17/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if SFR fails to prosecute its cross-claim against the McCoys on or before 1/17/2020, the court will dismiss the cross-claim. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
December 18, 2018 |
Filing
88
ORDER granting 87 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to the claims between U.S. Bank, N.A., SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, and Sherman Oaks Estates Owners Association. This Stipulation in no way affects SFR's cross-claim against David L. McCoy and Pamela McCoy (the "McCoys"). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Finance - MMM)
|
September 20, 2018 |
Filing
85
ORDER denying without prejudice 65 Motion for Summary Judgment and 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 16, 2018 |
Filing
80
ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 1/17/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 2, 2018 |
Filing
78
ORDER granting 77 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 1/12/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing
70
ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 65 and 66 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing
68
ORDER Granting 67 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply Re: 65 and 66 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/8/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 22, 2017 |
Filing
55
ORDER that 50 Motion to Amend is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file, within fourteen (14) days from the entry of this order, a first amended complaint identical to that attached to its motion to amend (ECF No. 50-1). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 5, 2017 |
Filing
53
ORDER Granting 52 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of 50 Motion for Leave to File (First Request). Replies due by 9/8/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
July 14, 2017 |
Filing
49
ORDER that 16 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 17 Motion for More Definite Statement is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 23 Motion to Certify a Question of Law is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing
47
ORDER Granting 45 Joint Motion to Amend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/9/2017. Motions due by 11/7/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 27, 2016 |
Filing
11
ORDER Granting 7 defendant's motion for security of costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall post a cost bond in the amount of $500.00 or make a cash deposit of $500.00 within 7 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
|