Equalia, LLC v. Kushgo LLC et al
Plaintiff: Equalia, LLC and Hoverboard Technologies Corporation
Defendant: Arthur Andreasyan, Halo Board LLC, Kushgo LLC and Shenzhen Windgoo Intelligent Technology Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02851
Filed: December 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER that 54 Defendants' Motion to Stay is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Stipulated Electronically Stored Information Production Order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 02/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF Nos. 10 , 42 ) is GRANTED, as follows: Defendants Kushgo, LLC, Halo Board, LLC, and Arthur Andreasyan, as well as their officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and any other persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this order are PRELIMINARILY ENJOINED, for the duration of this litigation, from Displaying, Depicting, Advertising, Marketing, or Selling the Halo Board, or an y substantially similar version thereof, online or in any physical location in Nevada or in any other place within the United States. The Defendants may not fulfill any current orders for their product and must refund any money they have received f or such orders to their customers. FURTHER ORDERED that security which the Plaintiffs have proffered for the Temporary Restraining Order shall serve as the security for this Preliminary Injunction. The Court will not require a further bond or additional security as the Court does not find one would be required based upon likelihood of success on the merits. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that 10 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall be required to post security of $50,000. This Order shall take effect as soon as Defendants receive actual notice of the posting of this security, and shall expire at the close of business on January 18, 2017, unless extended pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2) or dissolved prior to that date by the Court.FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing regarding the issuance of a preliminary injunction, as well as broader injunctive relief, is set for Friday, January 13, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re 1 Complaint. Kushgo LLC answer due 1/19/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equalia, LLC v. Kushgo LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Andreasyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halo Board LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kushgo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Windgoo Intelligent Technology Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equalia, LLC
Represented By: Lael D. Andara
Represented By: Stephen J Erigero
Represented By: Timothy J Lepore
Represented By: Marie E. Sobieski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoverboard Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Lael D. Andara
Represented By: Stephen J Erigero
Represented By: Timothy J Lepore
Represented By: Marie E. Sobieski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?