Dumont v. Leo A. Daly Company
Plaintiff: Francis X. Dumont
Defendant: Leo A. Daly Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv02864
Filed: December 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation to Vacate Hearing set for 11/14/2017 re 43 and 44 Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Clarification. Discovery due by 10/25/2017. Motions due by 11/24/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 32 Second Motion to to Continue Discovery Period. Discovery due by 9/25/2017. Motions due by 10/25/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/26/2017. No further extensions will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Early Neutral Evaluation. Plaintiff may file a supplement to his request by 5:00 p.m. today, 5/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dumont v. Leo A. Daly Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis X. Dumont
Represented By: Paul S. Padda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo A. Daly Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?