JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Williston Investment Group, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Heritage Estates Homeowners' Association, Martha Whalin, Scott Whalin and Williston Investment Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02874
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT. Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.s complaint is dismissed in its entirety. Judgment is entered in favor of defendants Williston Investment Group, LLC, Heritage Estates Homeowners Association, Martha Whalin, and Scott Whalin. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 4, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 34 Joint Motion to Amend 32 Order. The parties shall submit a Proposed Amended Judgment in the case to include defendants Williston Investment Group, LLC, Martha Whalin, and Scott Whalin within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 1, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant Heritage Estates Homeowners' Association's 9 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 6, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Joseph A. Gutierrez, Esq.'s 27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys of Record for Defendant Williston Investment Group, LLC. Williston Investment Group, LLC must retain new counsel if it intends to continue to litigate this matter by 7/6/2017. The Clerk of Court shall add the last known address of Defendant Williston Investment Group, LLC to the civil docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copy mailed to Williston Investment Group, LLC - SLD)
January 12, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 9 First MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint. Plaintiff's Responses due by 2/2/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Williston Investment Group, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Estates Homeowners' Association
Represented By: Julie Funai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Whalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Whalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williston Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lindsay C Demaree
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?