Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC v. Baum et al
Plaintiff: Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Charlene M Baum, Jared K Baum, Federal National Mortgage Association and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Counter Claimant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Counter Defendant: Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02888
Filed: December 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 81 Stipulation re 77 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 63 Motion for Default Judgment. IT IS FUTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter the judgment for declaratory relief and quiet title in the Subject Property against JARED K. BAUM and CHARLENE M. BAUM and in favor of the Plaintiff, CHAMPERY RENTAL REO, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying Plaintiff / Counterdefendant's 39 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Villas shall file its certificate of interested parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 12/5/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation to Extend Time re 51 MOTION to Dismiss Or in the Alternative, Motion for summary Judgment Pursuant to NRCP 56(a) re 42 Amended Complaint. (Responses due by 11/8/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 35 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) of Scheduled Deadline to Amend Pleadings and Add Parties. See Order for deadline. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC v. Baum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene M Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared K Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Casey Joel Nelson
Represented By: Bradley G. Sims
Represented By: John T Steffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Casey Joel Nelson
Represented By: Bradley G. Sims
Represented By: John T Steffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?