GVCL Ventures, Inc. v. GoPetFriendly.com, LLC
Plaintiff: GVCL Ventures, Inc.
Defendant: GoPetFriendly.com, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02892
Filed: December 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Temporarily Staying Execution of 88 Judgment against Michael Dillon. All efforts to collect money damages awarded against Michael Dillon in this case must be stayed pending further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 81 Stipulation; Re: 79 Motion to Enforce, Motion Hearing reset for 10/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Stipulation; Motion to Enforce Settlement due 9/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Stipulation; Discovery due by 9/10/2018. Motions due by 10/9/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Harold P. Gewerter withdrawn from the case. ; Attorney designation or Pro Se Notice deadline: 5/4/2018. Mr. Neziol and GVCL Ventures, Inc. must file with the Court written notification of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Address pursuant to order - JM)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Discovery Hearing set for 1/23/2018 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting Counterclaimant's 42 Motion to Extend Time to Serve First Amended Counterclaim and Granting 44 Motion for Service by Publication. A copy of the Summons and Complaint must be mailed to Dillon and Taylor at their last kno wn address by certified U.S. Mail, return receipt requested. The deadline to effect service of process is extended up to and including 1/19/2018 for Neziol, Dillon, and Taylor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Extend Time for Service of Complaint. GVCL is permitted to serve GoPetFriendly.com, LLC by publication. Deadline to effect service of process is extended up to and including 6/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GVCL Ventures, Inc. v. GoPetFriendly.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GVCL Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Harold P. Gewerter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoPetFriendly.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?