Agha-Khan v. Wells Fargo Bank NA A US Bank et al
Plaintiff: Salma Agha-Khan
Defendant: Chicago Title Company, Johnathan J Damen, Executive Trustee Services LLC, Fidelity National Default Solutions Inc, First American Title Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc., Amanda Rose Jones, Patricia Krause, LSI Title Agency Inc., Marin Conveyancing Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc,, Nationwide Title Clearing, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Routh Crabtree Olsen, Jeffrey L. Romig, Brett P Ryan, Kristopher James Sandberg, Servicelink aka Servicelink LLC, TBI Mortgage Company, Edward T Weber, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wells Fargo Financial National Bank and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
702) 471-7070 (fax: Merscorp Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02928
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 12 , 16 , 22 , 35 , 69 , 78 , 89 , 115 the defendants' motions are GRANTED and all claims asserted in the complaint are dismissed with prejudice against all defendants. The plaintiff's reques t for leave to amend is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 the plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 93 , 100 the plaintiff's motions for entry of default are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED th at 111 the Wells Fargo defendants' motion to set aside default is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 107 the defendant First American Title's motion to enlarge the time to respond to the complaint is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice as to defendants Marin Conveyancing Corporation, Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc., and Amanda Rose Jones only. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 86 Motion to Extend Time. Navy Federal Credit Union answer due 6/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 39 the Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED and Defendants Ocwen Financial Corp., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., and Merscorp Holdings, Inc. shall have up to and including 4/1/17, to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's pro per complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 20 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re 1 Complaint. Merscorp Holdings Inc. answer due 3/1/2017; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, answer due 3/1/2017; Ocwen Financial Corporation answer due 3/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re 1 Complaint. Fidelity National Default Solutions Inc answer due 3/6/2017; LSI Title Agency Inc. answer due 3/6/2017; Servicelink aka Servicelink LLC answer due 3/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 9 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint. Nationwide Title Clearing answer due 2/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a notice with the court disclosing all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) that have a direct, pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case no later than 1/24/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agha-Khan v. Wells Fargo Bank NA A US Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salma Agha-Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan J Damen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Trustee Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Default Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Rose Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Title Agency Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin Conveyancing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Title Clearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Routh Crabtree Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L. Romig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett P Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher James Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servicelink aka Servicelink LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBI Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward T Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 471-7070 (fax: Merscorp Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?