Tamares Las Vegas Properties, LLC et al v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Plaza Hotel & Casino, LLC, T-UPR, LLC and Tamares Las Vegas Properties, LLC
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv02933
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Granting 136 Motion to Extend Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting 134 Stipulation to Extend Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/15/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs must resubmit their confidential settlement conference statement to the undersigneds box in the Clerk's Office - no later than 3 p.m. on 10/25/19 - in a format that complies with both the Court's order at Docket No. 128 and Local Rule IA 10-3(i). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 101 Travelers's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaza's motion for summary judgment 102 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 113 Travelers's motion to strike is DE NIED and 116 Plaza's motion for leave to file a surreply is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REFERRED to a magistrate judge for a MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties' obligation to file their joint pretrial order is STAYED until 10 days after that settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Granting 118 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 113 Motion to Strike, 116 Motion for Leave to File Document. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting 98 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline and Briefing Schedule. Motions due by 10/19/2018. Responses due by 11/16/2018. Replies due by 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying 94 Stipulation; Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 84 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 9/7/2018. Motions due by 10/8/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 75 Motion to Extend Time Re: 75 Motion to Extend Remaining Discovery Deadlines. Replies due by 6/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting 77 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Daniel Rene Belzil terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Re: 75 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Responses due by 6/7/2018. Replies due by 6/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that 56 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines is DENIED without prejudice. Any renewed stipulation shall be filed no later than January 22, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation to Amend 52 Order to permit the parties to submit renewed briefs on truly unresolved discovery issues no later than 1/22/18. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 51 Stipulation to Amend 48 Order to permit the parties to submit renewed briefs on truly unresolved discovery issues no later than 1/8/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation to Amend 48 Order to permit the parties to submit renewed briefs on truly unresolved discovery issues no later than 12/18/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation. IT IS ORDERED that 35 the Court's Order dated 11/3/17 is amended to permit the parties to submit renewed briefs on truly unresolved discovery issues no later than 12/4/17. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that no later than 11/7/17, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall withdraw 31 , 32 , 34 the pending discovery motions in which they resolved any portion of the pending dispute during the 11/3/17, meet and confer. They may then submit renewed briefing on the trulyunresolved discovery issues no later than 11/13/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs' expert disclosure deadline is extended to 12/4/17. Defendant's requests for attorneys' fees and extension of other deadlines is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re Plaintiffs' 26 Emergency MOTION to Amend. The Court finds the pending motion shall be briefed based on the default timetable in the Court's Local Rules and will be resolved in the ordinary course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tamares Las Vegas Properties, LLC et al v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaza Hotel & Casino, LLC
Represented By: Shan D Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T-UPR, LLC
Represented By: Shan D Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamares Las Vegas Properties, LLC
Represented By: Shan D Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?