Lafayette v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lafayette
Defendant: Clark County, County of Clark, Julie Good, Zahara Joyner, State of Nevada and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Interested Party: Priscilla Baker
Case Number: 2:2016cv02935
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice. The clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 15 , 18 , 21 , 22 the defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED with leave to amend. If Lafayette can file an amended complaint curing the jurisdictional defects in his original complaint, he must file that amended complaint by 5/8/2017. If he fails to do so, the case will be closed. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 38 Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 11:00 a.m., 9/11/2017, in courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying 5 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lafayette v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Priscilla Baker
Represented By: Priscilla L Baker
Represented By: Thomas Beckom
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zahara Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?