Yousif v. The Venetian Casino Resort, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sharone Walker and Mustafa Yousif
Defendant: Las Vegas Sands, Corp., Las Vegas Sands, LLC and The Venetian Casino Resort, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02941
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Granting 166 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 163 Motion for Protective Order. Replies due by 4/17/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties Revised Stipulation and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' motion for protective order is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties will submit a Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule no later than 14 days following final resolution of Plaintiffs' motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Striking 159 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 154 the Parties' Stipulation and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' motion for protective order is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties will submit a Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule no later than 14 days following final resolution of Plaintiffs' motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting 150 Stipulation to Stay Action; Parties will submit a Joint Status Report no later than 15 days following the Parties' mediation. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Granting 145 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Patrick F Hulla withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Parties' Stipulation and Order to stay action in the above captioned matter is Granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties will submit a Joint Status Report no later than 15 days following the Parties' mediation to inform the Court if the Parties have come to an early resolution. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Granting 131 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 126 Motion to Certify Class. Responses due by 7/31/2019. Replies due by 8/31/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Granting 129 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 126 Motion to Certify Class. Replies due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting ECF No. 127 Stipulation To Extend Time re ECF No. 126 Motion to Certify. Response due by 5/13/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 112 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Approving FLSA Notice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting 105 Motion for Final Approval of Fair Credit Reporting Act Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 100 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 8/22/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Stipulation to File Fourth Amended Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file the Fourth Amended Complaint, attached hereto as Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 90 Stipulation re Disclosure of Class Data. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that 27 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court hereby EXTENDS the deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 class certification motion to July 27, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 Motion for Reconsideration. Any Responses due by 3/27/2017. Any Replies due by 3/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 25 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs' motions for conditional collective action certification and class certification shall therefore be filed no later than April 28, 2017. Defendants' response to each motion shall be due no later than May 30, 2017, and Plaintiffs' reply in support of each motion shall be filed no later than June 13, 2017. No later than March 28, 2017, the parties shall file supplemental briefing in support of their respect ive positions regarding ESI production and proposed discovery deadlines. Each party's brief shall be no greater than seven pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yousif v. The Venetian Casino Resort, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Sands, Corp.
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Sands, LLC
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Venetian Casino Resort, LLC
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharone Walker
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustafa Yousif
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?