Turpening v. Philson et al
Petitioner: Aaron Lee Turpening
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Philson
Case Number: 2:2016cv02947
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the petitioner must, no later than September 28, 2018, either: (1) file a notice confirming that his mailing address is still at Ely State Prison or (2) file a notice of his new mailing address. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that Respondents' answer due 20 days from date of this Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Extend Time; Case stayed pending appeal; Case terminated. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall, within 30 days after the Nevada Supreme Court rules on his appeal, file a notice in this case informing the Court of that ruling. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 17 Motion for Extension of Copy Work. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: 14 Order to P - JM)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 12 Motion to extend prison copywork limit by $50. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/72017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 7 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider 3 Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 02/01/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk shall file the Petition. Grounds 3, 4, 5, and 6 of the petition for writ of habeas corpus are DISMISSED. The clerk of the court shall add Adam Paul Lax alt, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents and shall electronically serve upon respondents a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus, and a copy of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 60 days from the date on whichthe petition is served upon them to appear in this action, and to answer or otherwise respond to the petition. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turpening v. Philson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Philson
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aaron Lee Turpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?