Calove v. State of Nevada et al
Counter Claimant: Marina Calove
Counter Defendant: Bobby Choudhury, Clark County, County of Clark, Rebecca P. Kern, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Rhonda L. Rorie, State of Nevada and Ron Ventura
Case Number: 2:2016cv02953
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice. The clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 49 Defendant State of Nevada's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the 12 , 15 , 16 , 28 , 42 defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED with leave to amend. If Calove can file an amended complaint curing the jurisdictional defects in her original complaint, she must file that amended complaint by 5/8/17 If she fails to do so, the case will be closed. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Ron Ventura shall file his Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 4/21/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 1 Calove's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 1/27/17, Calove must file an affidavit containing financial information sufficient for this court to determi ne whether she may proceed without paying the filing fee or pay the $400 filing fee. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of Calove's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calove v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Marina Calove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bobby Choudhury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: County of Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Rebecca P. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Rhonda L. Rorie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ron Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?