Stuppy v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, et al
Plaintiff: Sheila K. Stuppy
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp., Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 2:2016cv02954
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s 14 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 7 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time (Second Request) to Respond to Complaint. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage's answer due 2/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 4 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Wells Fargo Bank N.A.'s answer due 1/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stuppy v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Robin E Perkins
Represented By: Tanya N. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Robin E Perkins
Represented By: Tanya N. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila K. Stuppy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?