E&R Venture Partners, LLC v. Park Central Plaza 32, LLC
Plaintiff: E&R Venture Partners, LLC
Defendant: Park Central Plaza 32, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02959
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that Plaintiff's 38 Memorandum of Expenses Filed in Compliance with Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Compel and Denying Defendant's Counter-Motion for Protective Order is Granted. Defendant is ordered to pay Plaintiff the total sum of$10,330.16. Defendant is ordered to make the payment to Plaintiff by 10/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Motion to Continue Magistrate Judge Hearing re 42 , 44 Motions. ( Motion Hearing reset for 8/18/2017 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 25 Motion to Compel. The parties shall submit the proposed protective order to the Court within seven (7) days of the filing of this order. Plaintiff shall file a memorandum re 15 Motion to Compel by 5/15/20 17. Defendant's response due 5/29/2017. Plaintiff's reply due by 6/5/2017. Defendant's 29 Motion for Protective Order is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E&R Venture Partners, LLC v. Park Central Plaza 32, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E&R Venture Partners, LLC
Represented By: Nikki L. Baker
Represented By: Tamara Beatty Peterson
Represented By: Benjamin K. Reitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Central Plaza 32, LLC
Represented By: Jared B. Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?