Bank of America, N.A. et al v. Copper Creek Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A. and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: ATC Assessment Collection Group LLC, Copper Creek Homeowners Association and Elizabeth Peralez
Counter Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Counter Claimant: Elizabeth Peralez
Case Number: 2:2016cv02963
Filed: December 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counterclaimant Elizabeth Peralez's unjust enrichment counterclaim is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the clerk of court enter final judgment consistent with this order and my prior order 50 and close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Setting Deadline for Proposed Joint Pretrial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/7/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 39 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Denying 47 Motion for Summary Judgment as moot. See Order for specifications. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 39 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation to Stay Litigation. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation to Extend Time re 18 Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment. (Replies due by 3/16/2017.) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation to Extend Time re 18 Motion to Dismiss. ( Responses due by 3/2/2017.) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. et al v. Copper Creek Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATC Assessment Collection Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copper Creek Homeowners Association
Represented By: J. William Ebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Peralez
Represented By: Craig S Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Elizabeth Peralez
Represented By: Craig S Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?