Carter et al v. Richland Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christine Carter and John Carter
Defendant: Jerome R Bowen, RC Willey and Richland Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02967
Filed: December 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 82 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDERED that Plaintiffs refile their exhibits ECF Nos. 84-6 and 84- 7 to accord with LR IC 6-1(a). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 77 Stipulation Directing Experian and TransUnion to Produce Credit Information; Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 49 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 63 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply or a Supplement is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 66 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Supplement is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a proposed discovery plan/scheduling order no later than 10/1/18, which proposes deadlines for dispositive motions, responses, and replies. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time; ORDER Setting Hearing on 54 MOTION for Order to Produce Credit Reports., Hearing set for 1/4/2018 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 15 MOTION for Leave to File Its First AmendedComplaint. Replies due by 4/8/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. Richland Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome R Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RC Willey
Represented By: Chad Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richland Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Clement
Represented By: Jared M. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Carter
Represented By: Vernon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carter
Represented By: Vernon Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?