Ashcraft v. Welk Resort Group, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: John E. Ashcraft
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Welk Resort Group, Corp.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02978
Filed: December 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Ashcraft's objection 125 to the magistrate judge's order 122 is OVERRULED. The magistrate judge's order is affirmed in all respects. Ashcraft's motions to compel 102 , 109 are DENIED.Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Ashcraft's motion for summary judgment 130 and Experian's motion for summary judgment 134 are GRANTED in part: Ashcraft can proceed on his claims that Experian negligently violated §§ 1681e and 1681i when it prepared the May 2016 consumer (reinvestigation) report with a patently wrong status date. Ashcraft cannot proceed on his theories that reviewing county recorder's records is a reasonable procedure for a CRA to perform on these facts or that he suffered an adverse credit event because of Experian's inaccurate reporting. The motions are DENIED in all other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REFERRED to the magistrate judge for a MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties' obligation to file their joint pretrial order is STAYED until 10 days after that settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 149 and 151 Motions for Leave to File supplemental authorities. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 128 , 132 Ashcraft's motions to seal and redact judicial records are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain the seal on these judicial records. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Granting 136 Motion to Extend Time Re: 126 Motion to Certify Class, 130 , 134 Motions for Summary Judgment. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Granting 121 Stipulation to File Responses and Replies to Anticipated Motions for Class Certification and Summary Judgment. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Denying 102 , 109 Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Re: 102 and 109 Motions to Compel Class-Related Discovery. No later than 11/21/2018 Plaintiff shall either: (1) withdraw his discovery motions as unnecessary given the filing of his motion for class certification; or (2) withdraw his motion for class certification, in which case the Court will extend the deadline for seeking class certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting 110 Motion to Extend Time Re: 109 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 11/5/2018. Replies due by 11/27/2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the dispositive motion deadline is hereby EXTENDED to 12/14/18, and the joint proposed pretrial order deadline is EXTENDED to 1/14/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Denying 92 Motion to Compel and 96 Stipulation to Extend time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 68 Experian's objections are OVERRULED and 64 Judge Koppe's order striking Experian's Rule 30(e) changes is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 89 Stipulation; Discovery due by 10/15/2018. Motions due by 11/14/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 84 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Andrew Michael Cummings terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 66 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint stipulation with proposed deadlines by 1/17/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 71 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 68 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1. Responses due by 12/13/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying 30 Motion to Amend. Any stipulation to amend or renewed motion to amend shall be filed within 14 days of the issuance of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Denying 33 Motion to Seal and the Clerk'sOffice is INSTRUCTED to unseal the entire transcript at Docket No. 32 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that ahearing is set on 33 motion related to briefing on the motion to strike Experian's errata to its Rule 30(b)(6) deposition testimony for 2:00 p.m. on 9/25/17, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AMENDED ORDER re 40 Motion to Seal, filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. No later than 9/8/17, Experian shall file a supplement explaining (1) whether the compelling reasons standard applies to the instant motion to seal and, if the Cour t determines that it does apply, (2) whether compelling reasons exist sufficient to justify sealing the material. Plaintiff is not required to file anything further regarding the motion to seal, but he may also file a supplement on these issues if he would like to do so, by 9/8/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on 9/1/2017 to reflect correct document title (ADR).
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Motion to Extend Time re 33 Motion to Redact. (Responses due by 7/28/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER:Based on the parties' stipulation 28 , this court's powers under FRCP 1, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stipulation 28 is GRANTED in part; ALL DEADLINES ARE STAYED until July 14, 2017, to permit the partie s to work out their deposition issues identified in the stipulation; Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint 24 is DENIED without prejudice to its refiling by July 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Shorten Time re 15 Motion to Consolidate. ( Responses due by 4/25/2017., Replies due by 4/26/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashcraft v. Welk Resort Group, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Ashcraft
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welk Resort Group, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?