Carr v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Department et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Carr
Defendant: Francis Kleehammer, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Kyle McKnight
Case Number: 2:2016cv02994
Filed: December 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Defendants' 23 Motion for Summary Judgment is moot. The deadline to file the Joint Pre-Trial Order due 9/28/2017 is vacated. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting in part Defendants' 7 Motion for Partial Dismissal and for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff Stephen Carr shall file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file, no later than March 31, 2017, either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan; or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Carr
Represented By: Kelsey Bernstein
Represented By: Craig A. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Kleehammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?