JPMorgan Chase Bank v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: |
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. |
Defendant: |
Moushir Manious, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Seven Hills Master Community Association |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00004 |
Filed: |
January 3, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Presiding Judge: |
Gloria M. Navarro |
Nature of Suit: |
Constitutional - State Statute |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 19, 2020 |
Filing
67
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, Cross Claimant, against United Guaranty Residential Insurance Company of North Carolina and Moushir Manious, Cross Defendants. This case is now closed. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Main Document 67 replaced on 2/19/2020) (SLD).
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing
50
ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation to Stay Entire Case Pending Settlement (First Request). The parties must file a stip to dismiss or a joint status report by 6/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
January 11, 2018 |
Filing
48
ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (Second Request). Discovery due by 3/21/2018. Motions due by 4/20/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing
45
ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (First Request). Discovery due by 2/19/2018. Motions due by 3/20/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
June 23, 2017 |
Filing
34
ORDER Granting 31 Motion to Serve Moushir Manious by Publication and Granting 32 Motion to Extend Time to Serve. Time for service is extended by an additional 60 days from the date this order is entered to allow SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC to effectuate service by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
April 5, 2017 |
Filing
19
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Extend Time for Service and to Permit Service by Publication. Plaintiff has up until 7/5/2017 to serve Moushir Manious with a Summons and Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 6, 2017 |
Filing
12
ORDER Granting 11 Joint Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Chase shall deposit a check for $500.00 with the Clerk of the Court. Defendant's 9 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is Denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?