HSBC Bank USA, N.A. v. Estrella II Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Defendant: Estrella II Homeowners Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00016
Filed: January 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 74 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER Re: 61 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that SFR's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and the Association's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 52 Stipulation; Re: 50 Motion for Summary Judgment, 51 Motion for Summary Judgment, Replies due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Decision from the Nevada Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/28/2017.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. ORDERED that the Parties shall have an extension of thirty (30) days up to and until December 29, 2017, to file their respective Motions for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties s hall have up to and until January 19, 2018, to file their Responses to the respective Motions for Summary Judgment, including the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SFR on November 1, 2017 [ECF No. 34 ].Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline. ORDERED that the Parties shall have an extension of two (2) weeks up to and until November 29, 2017, to file their respective Motions for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED tha t the Parties shall have up to and until December 20, 2017, to file their Responses to the respective Motions for Summary Judgment, including the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SFR on November 1, 2017 (ECF No. 34 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Motion to Remove Attorney Shadd A. Wade from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that 9 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is stayed by operation of NRS 18.130(1) until the $500 cost bond is deposited. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC Bank USA, N.A. v. Estrella II Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estrella II Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Shadd A. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?