Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al v. Rancho Lake Condominium Unit-Owners' Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A. and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Mark Burley, Nevada Association Services, Inc., Platinum Realty and Holdings LLC and Rancho Lake Condominium Unit-Owners' Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00023
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.The clerk of court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of the plaintiffs and against defendants Mark Burley and Platinum Realty & Holdings LLC. FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs& #039; alternative damages claims against defendant Nevada Association Services, Inc. are dismissed as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation to Extend Time. Rancho Lake Condominium Unit-Owners' Association, Inc. answer due 2/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al v. Rancho Lake Condominium Unit-Owners' Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Thera A Cooper
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Thera A Cooper
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Burley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platinum Realty and Holdings LLC
Represented By: Michael N. Beede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rancho Lake Condominium Unit-Owners' Association, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?