Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al v. Washington & Sandhill Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC, New Direction IRA, Inc., Silver Stream Advisors, LLC and Washington & Sandhill Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv00026
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 48 Stipulation Confirming Existence and Validity of Deed of Trust. FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that 23 and 27 Motions to Lift Stay and 28 Motion to Schedule Briefing are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 38 Stipulation to Extend Time is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 56(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties may file Motions for Summary Judgment no later than July 27, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/14/2018. Motions due by 6/13/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER approving ECF No. 34 Stipulation re ECF No. 27 Motion to Partially Lift Stay, ECF No. 28 Motion to Schedule Summary Judgment Briefing: Replies due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA, 832 F.3d 1154 (9th Cir. 2016). Once exhaustion occurs, any party may move to lift the stay. Until that t ime, all proceedings in this action are stayed.FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice with leave to refile within twenty-one days after the stay is lifted.FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant New Direction IRA, Inc., s hall care for, preserve, and maintain the property located at 925 Swiss Street, Las Vegas, Nevada 89110 (the "Property").FURTHER ORDERED that, beginning on September 18, 2017, the parties must file a joint status report updating the Co urt on the status of this case every one-hundred and eighty days. Along with the joint status report, Defendant New Direction IRA, Inc., shall submit a statement affirming that all expenses necessary to maintain the Property are current and up to d ate.FURTHER ORDERED that this Order does not prevent the parties from continuing to engage in settlement conference negotiations with the assistance of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al v. Washington & Sandhill Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Direction IRA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Stream Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington & Sandhill Homeowners Association
Represented By: Wing Yan Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Brett M Coombs
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Brett M Coombs
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?